WHEAL MARTYN TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1001838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £439.58k £517.22k £1.51m £444.52k £459.72k
Total expenditure £589.77k £541.27k £498.73k £417.07k £416.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £25.00k £25.00k £25.00k N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £12.44k £77.69k N/A £76.08k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.76k £2.54k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £154.00k £150.55k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £358.79k £1.35m N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £2.68k £2.97k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £392.61k £355.33k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £21.33k £19.03k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.33k £3.36k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £127.33k £124.37k N/A N/A