Accounts and annual returns ST ALKMUND'S WARDENS FUND

Charity number: 1001855
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2022 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 April 2021 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required