Marketing Skills Trust Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and encouragement of education and training in the field of direct data and digital marketing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 February 1991: Standard registration
- 09 April 2024: Funds received from 1017040 GRAEME ROBERTSON CHARITABLE TRUST
- THE IDM (Working name)
- THE DM TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE INSTITUTE OF DIRECT AND DIGITAL MARKETING LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE INSTITUTE OF DIRECT MARKETING LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zara Valerie Easton | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Polly Jones | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Larkland Barnaby Myers | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Gillespie | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fedelma Good | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Troughton | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Patron | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10m | £7.17k | £62 | £62 | £18.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £294.68k | £454.73k | £125.35k | £125.35k | £139.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.10m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.62k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £190.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £99.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £5.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/01/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/08/2015 AS AMENDED ON 24 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 NOV 2018 as amended on 28 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN DIRECT MARKETING, AND MANAGEMENT ORGANISATION AND ADMINISTRATION AS APPLIED TO INDUSTRY COMMERCE GOVERNMENT AND THE PUBLIC SERVICE AT ALL LEVELS AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES, BOTH GENERAL AND SPECIALISED, FOR PERSONS TAKING PART IN OR INTENDING TO TAKE PART IN DIRECT MARKETING AND MANAGEMENT ORGANISATION AND ADMINISTRATION PROCESSES, TO IMPROVE LEGAL COMPLIANCE AND BEST PRACTICE IN THE FIELD OF DIRECT MARKETING AND GENERALLY TO ASSIST IN THE IMPROVEMENT OF EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING STANDARDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Beningfield Drive
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL2 1UJ
- Phone:
- 07802349596
- Email:
- kgould69@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
dmtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window