Financial history BOLTON YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1001884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £289.78k £276.12k £207.50k £277.55k £339.71k
Total expenditure £264.08k £260.80k £217.99k £175.22k £997.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £30.00k N/A
Income from government grants £80.33k £59.88k £22.50k £30.00k N/A