Accounts and annual returns THE GOOCH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1001936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required