THE MORLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1001967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katharine Louise Millage Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record
DAVID ECKLES Trustee 23 April 2015
1ST ATTLEBOROUGH ST MARY SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
Elizabeth Smith Trustee 23 April 2015 None on record
Corinna Pharaoh Chair 23 May 2014 None on record
Kim Local Trustee 08 September 2016 None on record
Ellen Louise Leary Trustee 24 May 2014 None on record
Robin Simon Vincent Pharaoh Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record
Thomas David Pull Trustee 07 May 2019 None on record
Timothy Edward Chenery Trustee 24 April 2015
MORLEY YOUTH FC