NIGHTSAFE LIMITED

Charity number: 1002057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £620.24k £640.19k £767.97k £1.13m £964.43k
Total expenditure £620.15k £621.89k £648.26k £1.03m £856.07k
Income from government contracts £187.00k £187.00k £218.08k £187.00k £163.20k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £55.19k £80.77k £162.31k £546.55k £245.80k
Income - Other trading activities £3.58k £4.51k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £561.38k £554.84k £605.32k £581.11k £718.30k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £329
Income - Other £82 £57 £343 £630 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £5.00k £0 £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £610.82k £609.37k £633.50k £1.01m £834.18k
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.33k £12.52k £14.76k £18.11k £21.89k
Expenditure - Governance £105.03k £65.00k £73.88k £0 £17.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0