THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH, PLUCKLEY

Charity number: 1002084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.75k £11.30k £6.80k £4.16k £3.25k
Total expenditure £2.54k £18.94k £1.46k £472 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A