THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH, PLUCKLEY

Charity number: 1002084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Ann Wyndham Trustee 20 April 2013 None on record
SARAH FRIES Trustee 22 April 2017 None on record
HELEN JANE MEARS Trustee 18 April 2015 None on record
mary willetts Trustee 22 November 2018 None on record
JAN CAMPAILLA Trustee None on record
GILLIAN FELICITY BUSHELL Trustee 06 September 2011 None on record
GILL HIGHWOOD Trustee None on record