THE JOHN HEMINGWAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1002178
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To assist a number of different types of Appeals which are of significant interest to the trust.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £114,686
Total expenditure: £145,140

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 March 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • JOHN HEMINGWAY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carina Robinson Trustee 10 December 2014
None on record
Robyn Hemingway Trustee 10 December 2014
None on record
THE MORGAN TRUST COMPANY LIMITED Trustee
THE LADY ROTHES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £122.00k £114.62k £358.13k £131.78k £114.69k
Total expenditure £491.21k £50.85k £122.21k £60.59k £145.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 13 March 2025 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 29 April 2024 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 29 April 2024 84 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 24 February 2023 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 March 2022 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 20 July 2021 165 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SECOND FLOOR
41 ST. JAMES'S PLACE
LONDON
SW1A 1NS
Phone:
02074995989
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available