Trustees BIRMINGHAM CHRISTIAN COLLEGE

Charity number: 1002205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev OSEI OWUSU AFRIYIE Chair 19 December 2016
THE CHURCH OF PENTECOST - UK
Received: On time
Rev Kwaku Junior Frempong-Boadu Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Rev Emmanuel Agyemang Bekoe Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Rev Eric Kwabena Nyamekye Trustee 24 June 2020
None on record
Rev Francis Owusu Kwaah Trustee 21 March 2017
None on record
ELDER KWAKU JOE ADOMAKO Trustee 18 September 2015
THE ERNEST FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CHURCH OF PENTECOST - UK
Received: On time
Winifred Agyemang Trustee 18 September 2015
None on record
Dr Lord Elorm-Donkor Trustee 17 December 2014
None on record
Dr Kwabena Agyapong-Kodua Trustee 17 December 2014
None on record