Financial history SOCIETY FOR COMPUTING AND TECHNOLOGY IN ANAESTHESIA

Charity number: 1002231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £6.20k £3.17k £4.46k £3.91k £4.76k
Total expenditure £3.26k £4.05k £4.56k £3.20k £5.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A