St Nicholas Hurst PTA

Charity number: 1002238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £23.67k £22.73k £24.53k £22.23k £24.42k
Total expenditure £11.90k £14.12k £23.40k £24.88k £23.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A