Accounts and annual returns ACLAND BURGHLEY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1002280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required