ACLAND BURGHLEY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1002280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MADELEINE HOLT Trustee 30 November 2015 None on record
Claire Melamed Trustee 05 November 2016 None on record
Katherine Ann Miller Trustee 01 October 2013 None on record
Sebastian Jose Camisuli Trustee 22 January 2020 None on record
Celia Grace Trustee 25 October 2017 None on record
Samuel Parkes Chair 19 November 2019 None on record
Tim Longfoot Trustee 28 January 2018 None on record