Accounts and annual returns NEVIS HISTORICAL AND CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1002304
Charity reporting is overdue by 673 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 308 days
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 308 days
Annual return 06 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 673 days
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 673 days
Annual return 06 April 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2019 19 January 2021 348 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2018 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2018 Not Required