NEVIS HISTORICAL AND CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1002304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/04/2016 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020
Total gross income £690 £860 £821 £800 £800
Total expenditure £2.03k £806 £926 £900 £900
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A