THE CECIL KING MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees identify projects and approach organisations they wish to support. The Foundation does not make grants to people or organisations who apply speculatively.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ghana
- India
- Ireland
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 22 March 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID RAILTON KC | Chair |
|
||||||
William Colin Dawson Clark | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Lynn McLachlan | Trustee | 08 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor COLIN GOUGH BA PHD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.94k | £65.74k | £82.93k | £93.28k | £114.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £233.05k | £240.16k | £266.27k | £281.51k | £250.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 MARCH 1991 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 28 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAVEL SCHOLARSHIPS TO JOURNALISTS AND MANAGERS UNDER THE AGE OF 30.(2) THE MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF VILLAGE CHURCHES AND CATHEDRALS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.(3) TO ASSIST CHILDREN IN IRELAND WHO HAVE BEEN ORPHANED DUE TO TERRORISM.(4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN PSORIASIS.(5) THE SUPPORT OF THE NURSES OR THE PHYSIOTHERAPY DEPARTMENT OF ST. VINCENT'S HOSPITAL, DUBLIN.(6) THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF THE SALVATION ARMY.(7) THE SUPPORT OF ANY OF THE DIRECT DESCENDANTS OF THE LATE CECIL KING WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.(8) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE LIVE PERFORMANCE OF MUSIC AND BALLET.(9) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT WHICH THE SAID DAME RUTH KING SHALL IN HER LIFETIME IN WRITING OR BY HER WILL OR CODICIL MAKE KNOWN TO THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Mountain Road
NEWTOWNARDS
BT23 4UL
- Phone:
- 07974180321
- Email:
- ckmf@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window