THE ROMSEY COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 10 April 1991: Standard registration
- 27 September 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 27 September 2006: Funds transferred to 1115681 ROMSEY COMMUNITY PRESCHOOL
- THE ROMSEY COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.72k | £31.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.26k | £33.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 28 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 28 February 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 05 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 13 June 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH. OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY(A)PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY,IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART.(B)ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN.(C)FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ROMSEY,HAMPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window