HINDU CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (WALES)

Charity number: 1002569
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £55.48k £62.01k £59.30k £60.88k £121.95k
Total expenditure £60.92k £57.38k £56.13k £66.12k £56.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £16.28k £50.00k