Accounts and annual returns THE FOLLY FELLOWSHIP
Charity number: 1002646

Charity reporting is overdue by 552 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 552 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 552 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 23 January 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window