Financial history THE FOLLY FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1002646
Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £15.95k £16.89k £15.80k £26.28k £20.27k
Total expenditure £13.52k £25.11k £17.47k £19.97k £17.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A