JACK WRIGHT MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 April 1991: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- JACK WRIGHT TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH SEPTEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
THE AWARD OF A SCHOLARSHIP TO BE KNOWN AS THE JACK WRIGHT MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP IN IRRIGATION ENGINEERING NORMALLY TENABLE FOR THE POSTGRADUATE STUDY OF AGRICULTURAL IRRIGATION ENFINEERING AT THE COLLEGE (B)IF AND AS OFTEN AS THEY MAY THINK FIT FOR THE AWARDS OF A SIMILARLY ENTITLED SCHOLARSHIP FOR THE PURPOSES OF OVERSEAS TRAVEL FOR THE STUDY OF SPRINKLER IRRIGATION PRACTICES OR FOR THE FINANCING OF SPECIAL RESEARCH PROJECTS AND (C)IF FOR ANY REASON THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK IT IMPOSSIBLE INEXPEDIENT OR INAPPROPRIATE TO EXPEND MONEYS FOR EITHER OF THE BEFORE MENTIONED PURPOSES GENERALLY FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING FURTHER EDUCATION IN SUBJECTS CONNECTED WITH AGRICULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window