THE MARY HARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1002680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 10 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 02 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 01 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 01 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 13 January 2017 On time Download