Financial history THE MARY HARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1002680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £665.21k £312.98k £694.56k £1.35m £1.17m
Total expenditure £146.72k £107.34k £98.22k £2.13m £1.66m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £402.40k N/A £662.08k £1.34m £1.17m
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £32.06k £11.10k £0
Income - Charitable activities £262.74k N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £72 N/A £418 £178 £15
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.47k N/A £10.00k £2.01m £1.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £139.25k N/A £88.22k £120.89k £117.35k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0