THE MARY HARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1002680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Parry Trustee 14 March 2016 None on record
The Rt Hon Richard Benyon Trustee
ST PETER'S UFTON CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Emma Van Zeller Trustee 10 November 2014 None on record
ANDREW STRIVENS Trustee 03 November 2016 None on record
SARAH HENDERSON Trustee None on record
Christopher Lumley Trustee 17 December 2013 None on record
Harriet Jane McCalmont Trustee 12 November 2018 None on record
KIRSTEN LOYD Chair None on record
Camilla Hargreave Trustee 04 November 2019 None on record
Georgina Woods Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record