R A VESTEY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1002784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 03/05/2016 03/05/2017 03/05/2018 03/05/2019 03/05/2020
Total gross income £3.06k £1.40k £3.27k £3.30k £3.33k
Total expenditure £3.50k £750 £1.83k £3.00k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A