Financial history BRIDPORT CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1002844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £80.15k £61.73k £65.73k £54.31k £55.65k
Total expenditure £47.25k £46.98k £104.38k £52.12k £46.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A