DAVID LIVINGSTONE MEMORIAL HEALTH CARE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1002863
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005

Total income: £3,215
Total expenditure: £4,706

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 May 1991: Standard registration
  • 08 September 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • DLMHCF (Working name)
  • DAVID LIVINGSTONE MEMORIAL HEALTH CENTRE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005
Total gross income £3.69k £3.22k
Total expenditure £749 £4.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 10 May 2006 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 21 March 2005 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required