THE POLDICE VALLEY TRUST

Charity number: 1002944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 November 2018 300 days late Download