Financial history JOHN LA ROSE TRUST

Charity number: 1003001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £64.58k £73.43k £62.02k £111.62k £86.72k
Total expenditure £50.51k £66.37k £69.17k £62.02k £104.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.60k £56.51k