Financial history We Change Lives (WCL)

Charity number: 1003023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.83m £6.58m £7.02m £7.02m £6.04m
Total expenditure £5.75m £6.71m £7.60m £8.02m £6.38m
Income from government contracts £322.80k £6.14m £6.23m £6.47m £5.32m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £7.10k £281.25k £137.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £324.89k £431.27k £2.71k £282.85k £140.37k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £6.72m £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.51m £6.14m £6.67m £0 £5.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3 £0 £4.20k £6.02k £5.58k
Income - Other £0 £6.10k £346 £1.40k £12.95k
Income - Legacies £0 £424.30k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.75m £6.71m £7.60m £8.02m £6.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £58.96k £61.95k £64.59k £0 £109.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0