THE DEVER SOCIETY

Charity number: 1003093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 August 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 12 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required