Financial history THE DEVER SOCIETY

Charity number: 1003093
Charity reporting is overdue by 130 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £2.37k £2.15k £4.58k £2.95k £4.32k
Total expenditure £1.47k £1.16k £3.39k £8.88k £10.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A