BRADFORD COUNSELLING SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide one-to-one counselling on any issue, especially for young people aged 13 to 25 Provide group work on issues, eg. sexual abuse/anger management/personal development Provide training in listening skills
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 12 June 1991: Standard registration
- 08 April 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 April 2008: Funds transferred to 1112779 BRADFORD COUNSELLING SERVICES
- OFF THE RECORD (Working name)
- BRADFORD YOUTH COUNSELLING SERVICE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.60k | £133.62k | £144.77k | £89.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.04k | £135.24k | £144.58k | £89.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 01 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 09 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 23 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 06 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 20 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 20 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAY 1991 AS AMENDED 13TH APRIL 1992, 25TH OCTOBER 1999 AND 22 OCTOBER 2001 AND 25TH OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT SUFFERING CAUSED BY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILL HEALTH OR BY SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A CONFIDENTIAL COUNSELLING SERVICE FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES BUT PRIMARILY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 13 AND 25, AND TO PROVIDE TRAINING IN COUNSELLING SKILLS AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window