TOYOTA-SHI TREVELYAN TRUST

Charity number: 1003181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Atsushi Terashima Trustee 31 December 2017 None on record
Gillian Mary Hammond Trustee 27 February 2020
INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS HOUSE Received: On time
THE INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS TRUST Received: On time
Takashi Okuda Trustee 01 July 2017 None on record
David O'Brien Trustee 12 June 2017 None on record
TOSHIHIKO OTA Trustee 04 December 2013 None on record
John Garbutt Trustee 12 June 2017
INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS HOUSE Received: On time
THE INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS TRUST Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN WALBROOK Received: 9 days late