SMETHWICK BANGLADESHI MUSLIM WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1003212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £30.33k £27.22k £35.43k £37.27k £22.03k
Total expenditure £10.07k £18.86k £18.87k £19.32k £15.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A