Financial history SHROPSHIRE BADGER GROUP

Charity number: 1003228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.70k £6.91k £6.44k £10.60k £6.20k
Total expenditure £4.42k £7.47k £4.96k £14.57k £5.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A