ZEPHYR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1003234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £66.51k £67.22k £71.11k £56.41k £44.40k
Total expenditure £130.15k £165.52k £142.21k £266.62k £126.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A