Accounts and annual returns THE CHRISTIAN SCIENCE ASSOCIATION OF THE PUPILS OF MRS DOROTHY STODDART-WATSON CSB

Charity number: 1003242
Charity reporting is overdue by 236 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 236 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 236 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 November 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2022 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required