Financial history THE CHRISTIAN SCIENCE ASSOCIATION OF THE PUPILS OF MRS DOROTHY STODDART-WATSON CSB

Charity number: 1003242
Charity reporting is overdue by 257 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £570 £375 £786 £862 £722
Total expenditure £2.95k £2.53k £4.49k £4.88k £3.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A