CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1003318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The income generated from the letting of All Saints Lodge is used to support the upkeep and repair of the fabric of the Parish Church and the maintenance of services therein.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £38,479
Total expenditure: £41,303

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 June 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVEREND RODNEY GRANVILLE DREYER Chair
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
Elixzabeth Claire Roberts Trustee 21 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
Lydia Henriette Klein Trustee 21 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
No Crowe Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Ann Henderson Trustee 19 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
Susan Diane Maskell Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Stephen Ringer Trustee 24 April 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
Sarah Louise Lindop Trustee 23 May 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
Nana Twym-Ampofo Trustee 01 November 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
Kwame Appiah-Peprah Trustee 01 November 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
Mary Gwendolee Brown Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Jane Cooper Trustee 22 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
PETER MURRAY WYLLIE Trustee 30 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
FELICITY MARY ROBINSON Trustee 25 August 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
LYNN PATRICIA MANSELL Trustee 25 August 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
Kent Graham Harries Trustee 09 September 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
SANDRA ROSALIND DREYER Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time
ALISON PATRICIA PARSONS Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.72k £34.32k £36.41k £37.30k £38.48k
Total expenditure £35.22k £34.32k £34.41k £30.30k £41.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Laurence Church
The Moor
Hawkhurst
CRANBROOK
TN18 4NT
Phone:
01580753397
Website:

No information available