Financial history THE ST ERTH TRUST

Charity number: 1003363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £4.73k £4.38k £5.05k £2.24k £763
Total expenditure £3.30k £1.73k £7.64k £2.57k £2.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A