Financial history GROUNDWORK FIVE COUNTIES

Charity number: 1003426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.66m £4.76m £4.28m £3.24m £3.07m
Total expenditure £4.71m £4.80m £4.30m £3.19m £3.17m
Income from government contracts £287.08k £952.82k £49.54k £49.55k £72.22k
Income from government grants £70.51k £132.96k £291.06k £29.38k £488.46k
Income - Donations and legacies £8.04k £6.00k £1.50k £29.38k £0
Income - Other trading activities £10.58k £11.12k £5.97k £1.55k £5.63k
Income - Charitable activities £4.64m £4.74m £4.27m £3.21m £3.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.00k £1.77k £2.49k £2.20k £620
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.56m £4.69m £4.22m £3.13m £3.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £151.27k £118.45k £79.58k £54.10k £45.12k
Expenditure - Governance £46.42k £63.38k £73.80k £41.29k £33.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0