Trustees GROUNDWORK FIVE COUNTIES
Charity number: 1003426

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Daniell | Chair | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Edward Wright | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eloise Idoine | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Court | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren Ibell | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Skinner | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margot Jane Madin | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JIM CREAMER | Trustee | 11 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.