THE BRADFORD PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to do a minimum of two shows a year; a pantomime in late November and a main book show / Musical in June. We rehearse twice/three times weekly and try to make these times a good social and fun occasion. In addition to the above we will from time to time put on a play, usually in March
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Bradford City
Governance
- 19 July 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katrina McEachran | Chair | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Barran | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Craig Deacon | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie McGovern | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Robinson | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.62k | £16.34k | £1.90k | £25.11k | £27.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.51k | £17.79k | £6.60k | £27.35k | £28.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 June 2023 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 June 2023 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 20 June 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 20 June 2020 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 1925 AS AMENDED 21 JUNE 1968 AND 13 AUGUST 1990.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Kath Wells Estate Agents Ltd
69 Lower Wortley Road
Wortley
Leeds
LS12 4SL
- Phone:
- 07712774080
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window