THE BLOOD CARE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1003619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activity is the supply and distribution of screened blood, resuscitation fluids, sterile transfusion equipment, rabies immunoglobulin and vaccines.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £195,664
Total expenditure: £211,313

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hong Kong
  • Mali
  • Netherlands
  • Nigeria
  • Somalia
  • South Africa
  • Switzerland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BLOOD CARE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julian Neil Bruce Chair 01 July 2019
None on record
Dr LUCY LORD MBE Trustee 17 June 2024
None on record
Bryan Pearson Trustee 15 January 2019
DREAM BIG GHANA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr Christopher Peter Lee Trustee 21 June 2012
WESTON PLANET
Received: On time
Dr Jane Barrett Trustee
EAST CHESHIRE AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS
Received: 38 days late
CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE FRANDLEY PREPARATIVE MEETING
Received: On time
THE DRS GREEN AND SLATER REST HOUSES CIO
Received: 93 days late
THE DRS GREEN AND SLATER REST HOUSES
Received: 25 days late
MICHAEL GORDON BRUCE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £289.44k £287.01k £223.87k £191.87k £195.66k
Total expenditure £290.52k £269.14k £223.47k £192.72k £211.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NORTH HOUSE
198 HIGH STREET
TONBRIDGE
KENT
TN9 1BE
Phone:
01732500250