PICKHURST INFANT SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1003649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 October 2020 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 October 2019 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 02 October 2019 94 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required