MILTON VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1003706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £168.32k £177.39k £155.86k £184.12k £177.14k
Total expenditure £157.18k £177.40k £153.32k £189.74k £190.07k
Income from government contracts £375 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £3.42k N/A N/A N/A