Accounts and annual returns ST EDMUNDS WARD COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1003707
Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2022 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 February 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required